TX HB1940 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the admissibility of evidence of certain extraneous offenses or acts in the prosecution of sexual assault or aggravated sexual assault or an attempt or conspiracy to commit sexual assault or aggravated sexual assault.
Title
Relating to the admissibility of evidence of certain extraneous offenses or acts in the prosecution of sexual assault or aggravated sexual assault or an attempt or conspiracy to commit sexual assault or aggravated sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EVIDENCE
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
EVIDENCE
SEXUAL ASSAULT