TX HB1938 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a grant program for law enforcement agencies to defray the cost of data storage for recordings created with body worn cameras.
Title
Relating to a grant program for law enforcement agencies to defray the cost of data storage for recordings created with body worn cameras.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#557 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#557 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#557 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |