TX HB1938 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a grant program for law enforcement agencies to defray the cost of data storage for recordings created with body worn cameras.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a grant program for law enforcement agencies to defray the cost of data storage for recordings created with body worn cameras.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#557 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#557
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1938
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01938I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01938H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01938E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01938S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01938F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01938I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01938H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01938E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01938E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1938&RcdVtNo=557&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=35

Bill Comments

feedback