TX HB1936 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-01HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-02-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback