TX HB1935 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the establishment of certain programs to support adult and postsecondary education and workforce development in high-demand occupations and green jobs.
Title
Relating to the establishment of certain programs to support adult and postsecondary education and workforce development in high-demand occupations and green jobs.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Chavez [D] | Sen. Robert Duncan [R] | Rep. Kino Flores [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Mike Villarreal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-06-01 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | Passed | |
2009-05-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Amended | |
2009-05-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-12 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Amended | |
2009-05-06 | Amended | |
2009-05-06 | Amended | |
2009-05-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
Subjects
ADULT EDUCATION
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
Education--General
Education--Junior College Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Education
Education--General
Education--Junior College Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development