TX HB1934 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for overpayment recovery and third party access to provider networks for certain insurance policies and benefit plans that provide dental benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for overpayment recovery and third party access to provider networks for certain insurance policies and benefit plans that provide dental benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback