TX HB1930 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to landlord and tenant dispute information reported by justice courts to the Texas Judicial Council and made accessible to the public.
Title
Relating to landlord and tenant dispute information reported by justice courts to the Texas Judicial Council and made accessible to the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#485 (Y: 82 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#485 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | House | Amended 1-Walle |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Justice
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Justice
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL