TX HB1929 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prohibition of certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prohibition of certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB389 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB22 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback