TX HB1916 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring trauma training for certain attorneys.
Title
Relating to requiring trauma training for certain attorneys.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Mary Perez [D] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1191 (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1191 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Miller |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Family
Family--Child Protection
Lawyers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT
Family
Family--Child Protection
Lawyers
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT