TX HB1914 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the civil liability of a children's isolation unit in a hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the civil liability of a children's isolation unit in a hospital.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1169 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1169
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1914
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01914I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01914S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01914F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01914I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01914H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01914E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01914E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1914&RcdVtNo=1169&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=113
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=114

Bill Comments 750

feedback