TX HB1912 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to air quality permits for aggregate production operations and concrete batch plants.
Title
Relating to air quality permits for aggregate production operations and concrete batch plants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
CEMENT & CONCRETE
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF