TX HB1907 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures for the expunction of arrest records and files for persons who complete certain court programs or pretrial intervention programs.
Title
Relating to the procedures for the expunction of arrest records and files for persons who complete certain court programs or pretrial intervention programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#804 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#804 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB686 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
STATE PROSECUTING ATTORNEY
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
STATE PROSECUTING ATTORNEY