TX HB19 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 89-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 89-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civil liability of a commercial motor vehicle owner or operator, including the effect that changes to that liability have on commercial automobile insurance.
Title
Relating to civil liability of a commercial motor vehicle owner or operator, including the effect that changes to that liability have on commercial automobile insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1550 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#588 (Y: 81 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amended RV#578 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#588 (Y: 81 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amended RV#578 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1550 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#588 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#578 |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amended 3-Smithee |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Leach |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment amended 2-Lucio |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Leach |
2021-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-29 | House | Postponed 4/29/21 5:15 PM |
2021-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-29 | House | Postponed 4/29/21 4:30 PM |
2021-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-29 | House | Postponed 4/29/21 3:15 PM |
2021-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-04-29 | House | Postponed 4/29/21 1:30 PM |
2021-04-29 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5) |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB17 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
ACCIDENTS
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
EVIDENCE
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
EVIDENCE
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General