TX HB1890 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development and implementation of a statewide strategy for legacy system modernization.
Title
Relating to the development and implementation of a statewide strategy for legacy system modernization.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions