TX HB1885 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the Texas Transportation Commission to establish variable speed limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the Texas Transportation Commission to establish variable speed limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#926 (Y: 99 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Amended RV#889 (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09 Effective on 9/1/23
2023-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-18HouseSenate passage reported
2023-05-17SenateRecord vote
2023-05-17SenatePassed
2023-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-17SenateRecord vote
2023-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-17SenateRecord vote
2023-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-17SenateRecord vote
2023-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-05-10SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-05-05SenateReferred to Transportation
2023-05-05SenateRead first time
2023-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#926
2023-05-03HousePassed
2023-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#889
2023-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2023-05-02HouseAmended 1-Canales
2023-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-07HouseReferred to Transportation
2023-03-07HouseRead first time
2023-02-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1885
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01885I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01885H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01885E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01885S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01885F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/amendments/html/HB01885H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01885I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB01885H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01885E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB01885E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1885&RcdVtNo=889&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2023
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1885&RcdVtNo=926&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=22

Bill Comments

feedback