TX HB1881 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to application requirements for low income housing tax credits for developments financed through the private activity bond program.
Title
Relating to application requirements for low income housing tax credits for developments financed through the private activity bond program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1829 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions