TX HB1878 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal and county permitting requirements to conduct certain repairs on residential buildings.
Title
Relating to municipal and county permitting requirements to conduct certain repairs on residential buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Gates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PERMITS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PERMITS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property