TX HB1871 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public access to juvenile court proceedings.
Title
Relating to public access to juvenile court proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1871 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01871I.htm |