TX HB1871 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duty of the comptroller to report sales and use tax information to certain taxing entities.
Title
Relating to the duty of the comptroller to report sales and use tax information to certain taxing entities.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - HB 1871Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales