TX HB1870 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to nonemergency medical transportation, shipping logistics, and coordination services for state agencies.
Title
Relating to nonemergency medical transportation, shipping logistics, and coordination services for state agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
Rep. Helen Giddings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous