TX HB1869 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to contractual subrogation and other recovery rights of certain insurers and benefit plan issuers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to contractual subrogation and other recovery rights of certain insurers and benefit plan issuers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-06 - House - HB 1869Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-25 Effective on 1/1/14
2013-05-25 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-14HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-14HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-14SenateRecord vote
2013-05-14SenatePassed
2013-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-14SenateRecord vote
2013-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-09SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-08SenateReferred to State Affairs
2013-05-08SenateRead first time
2013-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-06HouseRecord vote
2013-05-06HousePassed
2013-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-05-04HouseAmended
2013-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2013-03-05HouseRead first time
2013-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback