TX HB1869 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call

Summary

Relating to a determination of value for purposes of punishment of the offense of abuse of official capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a determination of value for purposes of punishment of the offense of abuse of official capacity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-06 Laid on the table subject to call
2009-05-06 Companion considered in lieu of
2009-04-29 Postponed
2009-04-29 Laid out as postponed business
2009-04-23 Postponed
2009-04-23 Read 2nd time
2009-04-23 Placed on General State Calendar
2009-04-20 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-07 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-06 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-06 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-01 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-04-01 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-04-01 Recalled from subcommittee
2009-04-01 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-24 Left pending in subcommittee
2009-03-24 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2009-03-24 Committee substitute considered in s/c
2009-03-24 Considered by s/c in public hearing
2009-03-24 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-10 Subcommittee members named
2009-03-10 Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
2009-03-05 Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2009-03-05 Read first time
2009-02-26 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SB828 (Same As) 2009-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/09

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback