TX HB1865 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy; requiring a student permit; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy; requiring a student permit; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#805 (Y: 121 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Read 2nd time RV#782 (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-04-30SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#805
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#782
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback