TX HB1864 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training regarding interactions with law enforcement during traffic stops.
Title
Relating to training regarding interactions with law enforcement during traffic stops.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1864 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01864I.htm |