TX HB1863 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of Make-A-Wish specialty license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of Make-A-Wish specialty license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1690 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1690
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB667 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1863
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01863I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01863E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01863S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01863F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01863I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01863H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01863E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01863E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01863S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01863S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01863F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1863&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1863&RcdVtNo=1690&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=109

Bill Comments 750

feedback