TX HB1857 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the instructional material list and supplemental instructional materials adopted by the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the instructional material list and supplemental instructional materials adopted by the State Board of Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18HouseNo action taken in committee
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback