TX HB1855 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training, continuing education, and weapons proficiency standards for correctional officers employed by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to training, continuing education, and weapons proficiency standards for correctional officers employed by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - HB 1855Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons