TX HB1852 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal regulation of manufactured home communities.
Title
Relating to municipal regulation of manufactured home communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
Housing--Manufactured Housing
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
Housing--Manufactured Housing
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant