TX HB1846 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prescribing and ordering of Schedule II controlled substances by certain advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants.
Title
Relating to the prescribing and ordering of Schedule II controlled substances by certain advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
REGISTERED NURSES
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
REGISTERED NURSES