TX HB184 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 82-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prevention of fraud in the conduct of an election; creating criminal offenses; increasing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prevention of fraud in the conduct of an election; creating criminal offenses; increasing criminal penalties.

Sponsors

Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]
Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Elections
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback