TX HB1837 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to motorcycle profiling by peace officers.
Title
Relating to motorcycle profiling by peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2141 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB2141 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB2141 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice