TX HB182 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to criminal asset forfeiture proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal asset forfeiture proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNo action taken in committee
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-13HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB247 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback