TX HB1819 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal consequences of engaging in certain conduct with respect to a firearm silencer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal consequences of engaging in certain conduct with respect to a firearm silencer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1411 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#929 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-18HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-17HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenateAmended
2017-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-09SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-05HousePostponed
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-31HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback