TX HB1819 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Aldine Improvement District; providing authority to impose a tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Aldine Improvement District; providing authority to impose a tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-21 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2011-04-05 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2011-04-04 Committee report distributed
2011-04-04 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2011-03-31 Reported favorably as substituted
2011-03-31 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2011-03-31 Committee substitute considered in committee
2011-03-31 Considered in formal meeting
2011-03-31 Recommendations filed with the Speaker
2011-03-22 Left pending in committee
2011-03-22 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-03-22 Considered in public hearing
2011-03-22 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-03-10 Referred to Natural Resources
2011-03-10 Read first time
2011-02-25 Transmitted to the Governor
2011-02-24 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback