TX HB1812 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to filing fees for certain candidates for office in primary elections.
Title
Relating to filing fees for certain candidates for office in primary elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2093 |
2021-05-04 | House | Postponed 5/6/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2093 (Similar To) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB2093 (Similar To) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB2093 (Similar To) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Elections--Primaries
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Candidates
Elections--Primaries
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
SECRETARY OF STATE