TX HB1808 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution and punishment of certain trafficking and sexual offenses; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution and punishment of certain trafficking and sexual offenses; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1918 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amended RV#765 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed as amended
2017-05-04HouseAmended
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-15HouseRead first time
2017-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback