TX HB1803 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information regarding private employers who have veteran's employment preference policies.
Title
Relating to information regarding private employers who have veteran's employment preference policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |