TX HB1800 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study to evaluate the effectiveness of community collaboratives in addressing the exploitation of elderly persons in this state.
Title
Relating to a study to evaluate the effectiveness of community collaboratives in addressing the exploitation of elderly persons in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts