TX HB1799 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of the Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act.
Title
Relating to the adoption of the Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-08 - House - HB 1799Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
Legislature
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
UNIFORM ELECTRONIC LEGAL MATERIAL ACT
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
Legislature
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
UNIFORM ELECTRONIC LEGAL MATERIAL ACT