TX HB1792 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain advanced practice registered nurses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain advanced practice registered nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in s/c
2019-04-04HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2438 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback