TX HB1791 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility for job-training programs provided under the self-sufficiency fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for job-training programs provided under the self-sufficiency fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2021-05-06HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 770
2021-04-29HousePostponed 5/6/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-10HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-03-10HouseRead first time
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB770 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback