TX HB1791 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying of handguns by license holders on property owned or leased by a governmental entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying of handguns by license holders on property owned or leased by a governmental entity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1316 (Y: 75 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1316
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1900 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1791
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01791I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01791H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01791E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01791S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01791F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1791&RcdVtNo=1316&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=128
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=129
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=130

Bill Comments 750

feedback