TX HB1791 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call

Summary

Relating to the use of a perpetual trust fund for a cemetery by certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of a perpetual trust fund for a cemetery by certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-12 Laid on the table subject to call
2009-05-12 Companion considered in lieu of
2009-05-12 Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2009-05-08 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2009-04-16 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2009-04-16 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-15 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-02 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-04-02 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2009-04-02 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-04-02 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-02 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-04 Referred to Urban Affairs
2009-03-04 Read first time
2009-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SB1103 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback