TX HB1790 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study on state lottery advertisement and promotion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study on state lottery advertisement and promotion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-10HouseAmended 1-Martinez
2019-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-03HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-03HouseWithdrawn from calendar (by author)
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback