TX HB179 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on November 12 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the application of new requirements for commercial underground injection control wells to be adopted by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to the application of new requirements for commercial underground injection control wells to be adopted by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB275 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INJECTION WELLS
PERMITS
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INJECTION WELLS
PERMITS