TX HB1784 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain requirements of protective orders and conditions of release on bond and to the criminal penalties for violating those requirements and conditions.
Title
Relating to certain requirements of protective orders and conditions of release on bond and to the criminal penalties for violating those requirements and conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS