TX HB1782 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a plan to increase the use of telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and interprofessional Internet consultations in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a plan to increase the use of telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and interprofessional Internet consultations in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Amended RV#1226 (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1226
2019-05-09HousePassed as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Cortez
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 4-S. Davis
2019-05-08HouseAmended 3-S. Davis
2019-05-08HouseAmended 2-Clardy
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Cortez
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback