TX HB1782 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protective orders against certain persons who are convicted of or placed on deferred adjudication community supervision for an offense involving family violence.
Title
Relating to protective orders against certain persons who are convicted of or placed on deferred adjudication community supervision for an offense involving family violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 1782Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
Family--Parent & Child
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Criminal Procedure--General
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
Family--Parent & Child
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PROTECTIVE ORDERS