TX HB1779 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Returned from the House for further action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Department of Public Safety to obtain and use criminal history record information for the purpose of performing certain departmental functions.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Department of Public Safety to obtain and use criminal history record information for the purpose of performing certain departmental functions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dale [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Returned from the House for further action |
2017-05-23 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2017-05-22 | House | Point of order sustained |
2017-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF