TX HB1777 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting an employer from accessing the personal online accounts of employees and job applicants through electronic communication devices; establishing an unlawful employment practice.
Title
Relating to prohibiting an employer from accessing the personal online accounts of employees and job applicants through electronic communication devices; establishing an unlawful employment practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - HB 1777Third Reading House (Y: 51 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Financial
Financial--General
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Management Relations
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Financial
Financial--General
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Management Relations